MERE LECTURE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of 3 Halls, stage, committee room, kitchen and toilets for the advantage of the people of Mere, in Wiltshire, and to promote spiritual, intellectual and social activities, i.e. Plays, films, sporting, medical and social activities, lectures and public meetings. Annual grants are also offered to organisations and local charities within 8 mile radius of Mere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

17 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 February 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES RUTTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Peter Manning | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Durkee | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Wilding | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Nichola Morton | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JANE HURD | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Harwood Fletcher | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jayne Catley | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE JEANS | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|||||
David Norman Lamb | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Rutter | Trustee | 27 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN WATTS | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wood | Trustee | 15 May 2005 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW REES | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANDREW BRISTOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN JAMES WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.31k | £57.06k | £61.84k | £70.66k | £75.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.79k | £90.27k | £44.79k | £59.90k | £43.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22ND. NOVEMBER 1
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE SPIRITUAL MORAL INTELLECTUAL OR SOCIAL WELFARE ALONG LINES NOT INCONSISTENT WITH NON-CONFORMING CHRISTIANITY OR OF THE PROMOTION OF TEMPERANCE AMONGST THE INHABITANTS. THE PROMOTION OF SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
MERE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
SWAINSFORD FISH FARM
WOODLANDS ROAD
MERE
WARMINSTER
BA12 6BY
- Phone:
- 01747860479
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window