LAND AND POSSESSIONS OF THE POOR OF ELY OTHERWISE PARSONS' CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants towards the relief of financial hardship, education, training and for medical needs including grants to other charities and community organisations. Also providing dwellings (almshouses) and supporting the residents who live them. All above activities are limited to an area of benefit which corresponds with the Local Government area administered by the City of Ely Council
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 21 November 1972: Standard registration
- THOMAS PARSONS CHARITY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOSEPH BRAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Gipp | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Turpin | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Venerable Richard John StClair Harlow | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph James Henry | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Margaret Lindsay | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Ambrose David Morbey | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Allyson Broadhurst | Trustee | 28 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT CLASBY | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
REV CANON MARK BONNEY | Trustee | 07 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD OLIVER SETCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.90k | £317.55k | £344.03k | £401.41k | £430.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £187.38k | £218.37k | £310.55k | £324.84k | £300.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 25 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 06 JAN 1634 AS AFFECTED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1972, NOTICE UNDER SECTION 2 OF CHARITIES ACT 1985 SIGNED 25 SEPTEMBER 1989, ORDERS DATED 7 FEBRUARY 2005, AND 10 AUGUST 2005. AS AMENDED ON 12 APR 2019
Charitable objects
(1) PAY ú45 YEARLY TO THE TRUSTEES FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE POOR'S LAND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION. (2) SO FAR AS REQUISITE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OR ANY NUMBER OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE GOVERNORS THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME. (3) FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF ELY AS THE GOVERNORS THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF THE CITY OF ELY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 Ward Way
Witchford
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 2JR
- Phone:
- 07964542346
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window