JAMES BRADFORD HELPSTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
our aim last year was to make sure all properties were occupied with helpston residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 15 February 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROSEMARY MORTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
James Behrens | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Nicholson | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gary Alderson | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ward | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Hitchborn | Trustee | 24 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH DOBSON | Trustee | 29 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOLDICH | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHEN JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Councillor DAVID OVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.89k | £17.79k | £17.58k | £17.56k | £17.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.78k | £10.02k | £14.17k | £9.11k | £21.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2023 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 November 2020 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 18TH AUGUST 1972
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF HELPSTON AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HELPSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH HOUSE
2 CHURCH LANE
HELPSTON
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 7DT
- Phone:
- 01733252348
- Email:
- crowson44@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window