THOMAS AXE'S NON-ECCLESIASTICAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Old People Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 12 July 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Coley | Trustee |
|
||||||
ARTHUR WILLIAM PASSEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
DOCTOR GRAHAM GORDON WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.77k | £2.11k | £946 | £1.96k | £2.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £1.57k | £2.08k | £1.21k | £958 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 January 2025 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 January 2025 | 448 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF THOMAS AXE DATED 20TH JULY 1691. AS REPORTED VOL 3 P 107 AND VARIED BY ORDER 24TH NOVEMBER 1914 AND SCHEME 18TH APRIL 1952. AND SCHEME DATED 28TH NOVEMBER 1963. AS AMENDED BY LETTER OF CONCURRENCE DATED 1ST JUNE 1995
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ACIENT PARISH OF OTTERY ST MARY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
OTTERY ST. MARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
50 Claremont Field
OTTERY ST. MARY
EX11 1NP
- Phone:
- 01404813961
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window