STRACHAN CHARITY

Charity number: 202736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO EXPRESS THE CHURCH'S CONCERN FOR THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS / POVERTY AND BRING SOME COMFORT THROUGH A CASH DONATION TO INDIVIDUALS / COUPLES / FAMILIES AT CHRISTMAS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £448
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 March 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE STRACHANS CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Brian Woollaston Chair
THE SAINT KENELM PILGRIMAGE SOCIETY
Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Elaine Mary Venning Trustee 31 May 2024
None on record
Richard Norton Trustee 31 May 2024
None on record
Meryon Cotterill Trustee 04 April 2024
PCC ST MATTHEW'S CAINSCROSS
Recently registered
CHELTENHAM CHRISTIAN ARTS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £418 £435 £435 £446 £448
Total expenditure £400 £400 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 16 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 October 2023 350 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 January 2022 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
98 Farmhill Lane
Stroud
GL5 4DD
Phone:
01453764757
Website:

No information available