COMMON ALLOTMENTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDES GRANT TO MAINLY LOCAL ORGANISATIONS THAT PROVIDE HELP TO LOCAL PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 24 April 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Insull | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Trevor Isaac | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Callaghan-Martin | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Mary Bright | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bruce Ashley Callaghan-Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Parish | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP WILLIAM CLOKE | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS MICHAEL SMITH | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES BRIGHT | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
DESMOND JOHN MAISEY | Trustee | 31 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEELEY ELLEN ELIZABETH ALLIN | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS SUE MILLS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.59k | £6.95k | £5.76k | £5.89k | £5.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.95k | £4.00k | £4.81k | £5.83k | £6.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
POOR RELIEF ACT, 1831 (1 AND 2 WILL, 4, C.42) SCHEME OF THE 12TH FEBRUARY 1968
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE BOROUGH OF GREAT TORRINGTON FOR WHICH PROVISION IS NOT MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF GREAT TORRINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
COUNCIL OFFICES
CASTLE HILL
GREAT TORRINGTON
DEVON
EX38 8AA
- Phone:
- 01805626135
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window