AXBRIDGE TOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and run the Town Hall as a public facility. Maintain the Square area of the town in floral displays. Administer and manage the property and chattels left when the Corporation of Axbridge was disolved by the Municipal Corporations Act of 1883.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £3,940 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 30 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER SCOTT | Chair | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Godwin | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence Arthur Beasley | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Chard | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Paine | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|||||
MIKE ANDERSON | Trustee | 12 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RIC CANHAM | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE JAMES STANLEY | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PARSONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN GRAHAM PAGE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.03k | £27.43k | £12.25k | £27.41k | £12.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.68k | £13.37k | £14.10k | £9.38k | £8.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.45k | £22.10k | N/A | £5.76k | £3.94k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 10TH MAY 1889 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF THE 26TH SEPTEMBER 1963. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
AFTER THE PAYMENT OF CERTAIN FIXED SUMS AND THE COST OF REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING THE TOWN HALL THE RESIDUE OF THE INCOME IS APPLICABLE FOR PUBLIC PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF AXBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westlake Cottage
Moorland Street
Axbridge
Axbridge
Somerset
BS26 2BA
- Phone:
- 07711239673
- Email:
- grpaine@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window