WALGRAVE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Main activity of Walgrave Relief in Need charity is for the relief of poverty for the elderly residents in the village of Walgrave.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 29 June 1979: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN WATTS | Chair | 21 August 1975 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Evans | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Michael Bent | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Wendy Price | Trustee | 06 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE KING | Trustee | 01 December 2008 |
|
|
||||
MR B KNIGHT | Trustee | 07 December 2004 |
|
|
||||
STUART RONALD WISKEN | Trustee | 04 December 2001 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BROWN | Trustee | 06 December 1994 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARGARET BROCKETT | Trustee | 06 December 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28k | £2.28k | £2.29k | £2.88k | £4.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20k | £1.97k | £1.95k | £2.09k | £3.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
FOR RELIEF EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN PARISH OF WALGRAVE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WALGRAVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Old Road
Walgrave
Northampton
NN6 9QW
- Phone:
- 01604781488
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window