BLAKESLEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to students (post 16 education) and apprentices. Grants to widows of the parish. Grants to the poor (post retirement). Grants to pensioners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 April 1962: Standard registration
- DUCHESS OF DUDLEY CHARITY - CLEAVES CHARITY - FOXLEY CHARITY (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Sue Stanley | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jen Haselwood | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gulliman | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sally Woodman | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prof Will Stewart | Trustee | 31 October 2006 |
|
|
||||
Nicola MANNERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN CHARLES SPIBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Patricia OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.42k | £11.03k | £7.23k | £19.81k | £14.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.77k | £17.83k | £14.50k | £14.35k | £11.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS
Area of benefit
BLAKESLEY
Linked charities
- 26 April 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bakery
Main Street
Woodend
TOWCESTER
NN12 8RX
- Phone:
- 07796276366
- Email:
- sally.woodman@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window