MRS RACHEL GOLDSMITH CHARITY FOR THE POOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Discretion of vicar and churchwardens-for public benefit
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 February 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Andrew William Rose | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Susan Elizabeth Hutton | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Krystyna Helena Hagerty | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £1.72k | £1.86k | £2.20k | £2.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £910 | £0 | £628 | £5.12k | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
THEWILL DATED 14TH MAY 1925 PROVED 1ST FEBRUARY 1935.
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF ALDBOURNE.
Area of benefit
ALDBOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Marlborough Road
Aldbourne
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 2DD
- Phone:
- 01672541362
- Email:
- Chris@aldbourne.me.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window