Financial history THE HULSE HALL

Charity number: 202978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.57k £23.04k £19.68k £11.42k £13.18k
Total expenditure £8.85k £3.34k £8.54k £6.43k £39.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.14k £10.67k £500 N/A