WILLOW ALMSHOUSES FOUNDED BY MRS MARY ANN KENNET OF PETERSFIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing for Almspersons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 13 June 1969: Standard registration
- WILLOW ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Wallace | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||
John Edge | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|||
Jacob Copeland | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|||
Sarah Elizabeth Anne Moss | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|||
Yvette Paula Wands | Trustee | 03 May 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £187.89k | £15.86k | £14.42k | £19.79k | £22.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.38k | £12.38k | £133.98k | £18.90k | £18.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15TH AUGUST 1988
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF AT LEAST 60 YEARS OF AGE AND RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF PETERSFIELD, WITH A PREFERENCE FOR POOR MEN. FOR QUALIFICATION OF RESIDENTS SEE CLAUSE 12 OF SCHEME.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISHES OF PETERSFIELD AND SHEET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carding House
16 Sheep Street
Petersfield
Hampshire
GU32 3JX
- Phone:
- 01730261681
- Email:
- sarah.moss3@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window