THE WITNEY TOWN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates 18 Almshouses for the poor and needy in the town of Witney, Oxfordshire. The Charity also provides grants for those in need within the area of West Oxfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHLEY FARMER | Chair | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip J Wright | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Anne Jones | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judith M White | Trustee | 08 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Meadows | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Christine Baker | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Collicutt | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rachel Crouch | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Barry Beadle | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WOODWARD | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Joycelyn Aitman | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Brendan Kay | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr PAUL ANTHONY WATSON | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.03k | £128.85k | £125.67k | £183.53k | £182.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.48k | £104.79k | £122.70k | £131.41k | £157.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 OCTOBER 1981 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 8 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS. 2) THE RELIEF OF POOR PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF WITNEY AS CONSTITUTED FROM TIME TO TIME
Contact information
- Address:
-
66 Woodstock Road
WITNEY
OX28 1DU
- Phone:
- 07867 870436
- Email:
- witneytowncharity@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window