HIGHWEEK CHARITIES

Charity number: 203004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing financial help to the elderly and needy in the parish of Highweek, Devon. Also providing almshouse accommodation to the elderly and needy in the parish.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £48,214
Total expenditure: £45,235

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 May 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Buscombe Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
OLIVER GIDDINGS Trustee 31 May 2022
None on record
PENNY HAMMOND Trustee 31 May 2022
FREDERICK LIONEL LEAMAN AND ANNIE LEAMAN BEQUEST
Received: On time
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
RICHARD JENKS Trustee 16 July 2019
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
FREDERICK LIONEL LEAMAN AND ANNIE LEAMAN BEQUEST
Received: On time
PHILIP BULLIVANT Trustee 16 July 2019
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
FREDERICK LIONEL LEAMAN AND ANNIE LEAMAN BEQUEST
Received: On time
NEWTON ABBOT COMMUNITY TRANSPORT ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Rev gareth REGAN Trustee 14 November 2018
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
FREDERICK LIONEL LEAMAN AND ANNIE LEAMAN BEQUEST
Received: On time
Liz Roberts Trustee 31 December 2014
None on record
ROBERT BRYANT Trustee 23 November 2009
DR MAPLETON'S PRIZES
Received: On time
FREDERICK LIONEL LEAMAN AND ANNIE LEAMAN BEQUEST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £47.02k £49.52k £47.66k £49.32k £48.21k
Total expenditure £47.45k £31.96k £56.81k £661.17k £45.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 23 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 January 2024 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 January 2024 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 6/5/1987
Charitable objects
1) PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES 3) TO AUGMENT THE INCOME OF THE HIGHWEEK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Area of benefit
FORMER PARISH OF HIGHWEEK AS CONSTITUTED ON 30/3/1967
Registration history
  • 06 May 1987 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
4 CASTLEWOOD AVENUE
HIGHWEEK
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ12 1NX
Phone:
01626 367693
Website:

No information available