Financial history ALLOTMENT CHARITY FOR POOR

Charity number: 203006
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £1.12k £1.83k £1.84k £2.27k £2.30k
Total expenditure £560 £1.20k £1.99k £1.68k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A