Accounts and annual returns LADY BROWN'S COTTAGE HOMES

Charity Number: 203021
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2009 02 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2009 02 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2008 11 March 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 30 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2007 02 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2007 13 February 2008 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2006 14 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2006 14 November 2006 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2005 15 December 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2005 15 December 2005 On Time