THE OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 203043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Preservation and enhancement, for the benefit of the public, of the amenities of the city of Oxford and its surroundings. Promotion and encouragement of public interest in and knowledge of the history of the city of Oxford and its surroundings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1962: Standard registration
  • 12 February 2025: Funds received from 238259 CRITCHLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • OPT (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Gordon Stevenson Trustee 11 December 2024
THE SUNNINGWELL SCHOOL OF ART
Received: On time
Emily Julie Naomi Gee Trustee 21 November 2023
None on record
Mark Beard Trustee 22 June 2023
PREP SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time
Cllr Elizabeth Diggins Trustee 28 September 2022
None on record
Nick Leimu-Brown Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
ROSALIND CLAIRE ROGERS Trustee 14 October 2021
HEADINGTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
RISINGHURST COMMUNITY-ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
HEADINGTON QUARRY VILLAGE HALL
Received: 74 days late
Dame Helen Frances Ghosh Trustee 17 June 2021
BLACKFRIARS OVERSEAS AID TRUST
Received: On time
Philip Christopher Liam Parker Trustee 27 June 2019
WOOTTON CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
WOOTTON CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
HULME TRUST ESTATES (EDUCATIONAL)
Received: On time
THE KING'S HALL AND COLLEGE OF BRASENOSE IN OXFORD
Received: On time
THE 1815 CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
Joseph Handibry Mbatu Tah Trustee 18 June 2019
None on record
Ann Louise Upton Trustee 01 January 2018
OLD MARSTON CHARITIES TRUST
Received: On time
Professor William Hadden Whyte Trustee 01 July 2015
SAINT JOHN BAPTIST COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
OXFORD HISTORICAL SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETERS CHURCH WOLVERCOTE
Received: On time
OXFORDSHIRE VICTORIA COUNTY HISTORY TRUST
Received: On time
Susanna Pressel Trustee 01 September 2013
THE CITY OF OXFORD CHARITY LIMITED
Received: On time
THE OXFORDSHIRE BUILDINGS TRUST
Received: On time
JULIAN MUNBY BA, FSA Trustee 25 June 2013
THE HISTORIC TOWNS TRUST
Received: On time
Professor Heather Ann VILES Trustee
None on record
DAVID STREAT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £890.50k £891.76k £832.01k £2.07m £790.13k
Total expenditure £796.75k £814.18k £1.22m £816.23k £1.27m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £119.00k £37.17k £7.86k £26.26k £500
Income - Donations and legacies £446.40k £484.81k £447.53k £395.95k £313.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £320.88k £301.63k £268.36k £257.25k £345.03k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £123.21k £105.33k £116.12k £133.35k £131.97k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.29m £0
Income - Legacies £115.72k £40.51k £27.52k £27.20k £500
Expenditure - Charitable activities £757.65k £770.74k £1.17m £761.89k £1.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.87k £43.44k £48.53k £54.35k £41.00k
Expenditure - Governance £7.93k £8.67k £10.11k £11.06k £12.84k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £13.39k £20.20k £22.58k £22.94k £8.60k
Expenditure - Other £1.24k £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £2.74m £2.74m £2.73m £3.21m £3.20m
Long-term investments £3.69m £3.77m £4.12m £3.63m £3.77m
Other assets £846.56k £969.64k £580.00k £1.41m £1.00m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £95.05k £112.70k £81.73k £113.49k £178.37k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OXFORD PRESERVATION TRUST
10 TURN AGAIN LANE
OXFORD
OX1 1QL
Phone:
01865242918