Financial history THE BRETFORTON MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 203103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £14.38k £12.83k £9.29k £7.16k £9.20k
Total expenditure £5.99k £15.07k £11.32k £6.99k £8.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A N/A