Welland Residents Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives grants to persons and organisations in the parish of Welland in Worcestershire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 March 1962: Standard registration
- WELLAND CHARITY (Working name)
- POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
- THE POOR'S LAND, WELLAND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Sampson | Trustee | 22 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||
CLARE ADAMS | Trustee | 26 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Alison Martin | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||
Dr Ann Davis | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Dr Joanna Sherwood | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Barry Unwin | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||
ALISON AYLING | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
COUNCILLOR MICK DAVIES | Trustee | 07 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £586 | £498 | £673 | £578 | £900 | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £630 | £400 | £1.25k | £550 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 5TH OCTOBER 1906, AS AMENDED ON 15TH JANUARY 2004 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S74(2)(D)(II) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993, AND S.74(2)(C) RESOLUTION DATED 24 JANUARY 2006 as amended on 05 Jun 2023 as amended on 21 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WELLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Lime Grove
Welland
MALVERN
Worcestershire
WR13 6LY
- Phone:
- 01684311009
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window