TOLLER PORCORUM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing and maintaining the village hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Dorset
Governance
- 19 January 1962: Standard registration
- TOLLER PORCORUM PARISH HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ennals | Chair | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rorie Geddes | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Curry | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Comer | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Crumpton | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Stantiford | Trustee | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Johnson | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Feaver | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Frances Burt | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL WILLIAM RAWLING | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE GAIL WOODFORD | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
JANE ELIZABETH ENNALS | Trustee | 30 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS JUDY MILLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DEBORAH MARY BILLEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THELMA DAWN BILLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £19.99k | £4.87k | £4.47k | £4.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.92k | £8.79k | £13.33k | £7.48k | £8.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £9.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGULATED BY A SCHEME DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TOLLER PORCORUM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING THE USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TOLLER PORCORUM PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 High Street
Toller Porcorum
DORCHESTER
Dorset
DT2 0DN
- Phone:
- 01300 321365
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window