POOR'S PLATT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity receives income from the letting of pasture land which is distributed to the elderly and others in need in the hamlet of Purton Stoke.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 March 1962: Standard registration
- PURTON STOKE POORS PLATT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES Sabeston CASLAW | Chair | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Jane Williams | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Janet Stares | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Fallon | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Young | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
William Birkmyre Sutherland McIvor | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM JAMES PONTING | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRIAN MARK SCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN ELLIOT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65k | £1.65k | £1.55k | £1.55k | £1.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67k | £1.51k | £1.61k | £1.63k | £2.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 04 February 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARITY COMMISSIONER SCHEME DATED 24TH DECEMBER 1897 REP. VOL. 29 P. 1290, AND SCHEME OF 10TH FEBRUARY 1982.
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT WITHIN AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKIN GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PERSONS RESIDENT WITHIN ONE MILE RADIUS OF CHURCH BUSH HALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 PURTON STOKE
SWINDON
SN5 4JG
- Phone:
- 01793770817
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window