WOOTTON BASSETT TOWN HALL AND TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal focus of the trust's activities during the 2020-2021 has been the welfare of the Town Hall. In addition the trust has been continued support the development of the museum group and is helping steer them towards independence. The market continues to bring steady income which also helps support maintenance of the town hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 27 February 1962: Standard registration
- TOWN HALL AND TRUST CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROYAL WOOTTON BASSETT TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee | 10 February 2003 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.17k | £17.81k | £7.81k | £8.53k | £6.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.85k | £3.85k | £7.10k | £7.64k | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 261 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10 FEBRUARY 2003
Charitable objects
1) UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF WOOTTON BASSETT TOWN HALL; AND 2) THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WOOTTON BASSETT IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF WOOTTON BASSETT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Wootton Bassett Town Council
117 High Street
Royal Wootton Bassett
SWINDON
SN4 7AU
- Phone:
- 01793850222
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window