Histon and Impington Town Charity

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF HISTON & IMPINGTON WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 05 April 1962: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 19 July 2011: Re-registered
- 09 March 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 April 2013: Re-registered
- HISTON POORS LANDS (Previous name)
- POORS LANDS (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Jane Fisher | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Dr BRIAN STUART ING | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|||||||||
MRS M.C. CLEAVER | Trustee | 12 May 2008 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev NEIL JAMES BLANDFORD-BAKER | Trustee | 28 June 2006 |
|
|||||||||
Ian Maxwell PARISH | Trustee | 04 July 2001 |
|
|||||||||
MR A.P.M.GLASS | Trustee | 04 July 2001 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.32k | £5.39k | £4.99k | £5.09k | £6.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £4.07k | £3.22k | £4.71k | £4.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 04 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13 DECEMBER 2006 as amended on 18 Apr 2018 as amended on 18 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 2) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OF BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: (A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (B) ONLY TEMPORARY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
HISTON AND IMPINGTON
Linked charities
- 05 April 1962 : Standard registration
- 09 March 2011 : Removed
- 19 July 2011 : Re-registered
- 09 March 2013 : Removed
- 21 April 2013 : Re-registered
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 VILLA PLACE
IMPINGTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB24 9PR
- Phone:
- 01223232241
- Email:
- marcamb@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window