THE ROYAL NAVAL AND ROYAL MARINE MATERNITY HOME AND CHILD WELFARE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 10 April 1962: Standard registration
- 12 July 1994: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14.3.1923; CONVEYANCE DATED 10.9.1932; SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 12.2.1952 AND A SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS 25.10.1957.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A MATERNITY HOME AND CHILD WELFARE CENTRE FOR A LIMITED NUMBER OF WIVES OF OFFICERS AND OF THE WIVES OF MEN OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL MARINES BELOW THE RANK OF COMMISSIONED OFFICER. (SEE SCHEME DATED 25TH OCTOBER,1957).
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF PORTSMOUTH, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.