KNOWLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running & maintaining a village hall for the benefit of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 07 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley Alderson | Chair | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Natalie Sweet | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Judith Franklin | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Manfield | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Frances Richardson | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Healey | Trustee | 09 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Branfield | Trustee | 02 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACKIE COX | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAT HAYMAN | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
MANDY DICKINSON | Trustee | 29 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.96k | £51.62k | £18.48k | £14.04k | £15.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.91k | £71.01k | £18.12k | £13.81k | £10.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £31.45k | £8.10k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 5TH. MAY,1947. AND SCHEME OF 26 JANUARY 1977.
Charitable objects
PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION, AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
KNOWLE AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knowle Village Hall
Knowle
Budleigh Salterton
Budleigh Salterton
EX9 6AP
- Phone:
- 07514 020520
- Email:
- knowlevh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window