MARY TAVY READING ROOM

Charity number: 203396
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Snooker & billiards.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024

Total income: £1,078
Total expenditure: £5,012

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MARY TAVY READING ROOM AND SNOOKER CLUB (Working name)
  • MARY TAVY PARISH READING AND RECREATION ROOMS (Previous name)
  • MARY TAVY READING ROOM (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR PAUL WILLIAMS Chair
ROTARY CLUB OF YELVERTON TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Rikki Keith Elliott Trustee 11 April 2018
None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN KYNVIN BANKS Trustee 18 January 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £1.19k £12.01k £1.14k £1.24k £1.08k
Total expenditure £1.42k £1.14k £1.70k £5.04k £5.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.33k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 19 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Reading Room
Bal Lane
Mary Tavy
Tavistock
PL19 9PE
Phone:
01822810001
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available