THE DARTMOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Dartmouth Trust is the custodian of a permanent endowment. Its task is to manage its investment portfolio for the benefit of the 3 named charities. This requires the charity to invest efficiently and commercially, producing a stable and if possible growing income for the beneficiaries. The endowment is invested in a mix of commercial and residential property and financial investments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income:
£768,560
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £756.78k | |
Other | £11.78k |
Total expenditure:
£768,560
Raising funds | £203.38k | |
Charitable activities | £565.18k | |
Other | £0 |
£2,092,465 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £203.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £565.18k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £203.38k | |
Charitable expenditure | £565.18k | |
Retained for future use | £2.09m |
People

3 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 24 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Radovan Vuckovic | Trustee | 11 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Croft | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stuart Gordon | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Charles Rendell | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
LARA OSGOOD | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Langley | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Stephen Lucas | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Shepherd | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Sutton-Scott-Tucker | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Morgan Ellwood | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £858.63k | £755.41k | £752.38k | £775.76k | £768.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £858.63k | £780.41k | £851.53k | £775.76k | £768.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £486.62k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £853.07k | £749.75k | £264.93k | £775.40k | £756.78k | |
|
Income - Other | £5.56k | £5.65k | £830 | £355 | £11.78k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £724.59k | £613.67k | £725.33k | £775.76k | £565.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £124.07k | £166.74k | £126.20k | £0 | £203.38k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.98k | £4.88k | £5.50k | £4.76k | £5.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £608.79k | £719.83k | £595.90k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £124.07k | £166.74k | £126.20k | £0 | £197.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £9.98k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £57.20k | £57.20k | £5.74m | £4.61m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.53m | £12.74m | £7.08m | £6.44m | £13.11m | |
|
Other assets | £553.99k | £602.26k | £415.86k | £1.59m | £1.61m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £613.01k | £735.13k | £590.68k | £735.16k | £719.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 06 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/04/2014 as amended on 19 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
(1) ONE HALF OF THE INCOME TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE DARTMOUTH UNITED CHARITIES FOR APPLICATION BY THE LAST-MENTIONED TRUSTEES FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE LAST-MENTIONED CHARITIES. (2) ONE THIRD OF THE INCOME TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY FOR APPLICATION BY THE LAST-MENTIONED TRUSTEES TOWARDS THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH OF ST. SAVIOUR, DARTMOUTH. (3) THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE REMAINING ONE SIXTH OF THE SAID INCOME TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE PUBLIC PURPOSES CHARITY FOR APPLICATION BY THE TRUSTEES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DARTMOUTH AS THE TRUSTEE THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
DARTMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dartmouth Trust
38 Victoria Road
DARTMOUTH
Devon
TQ6 9SA
- Phone:
- 01803 835006
- Email:
- info@dartmouthtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window