COUNSEL AND CARE FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
COUNSEL AND CARE IS A NATIONAL CHARITY WORKING WITH OLDER PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS TO GET THE BEST CARE AND SUPPORT. AS PART OF INDEPENDENT AGE WE PROVIDE PERSONALISED, IN-DEPTH ADVICE AND INFORMATION, WHICH INFORMS OUR RESEARCH AND CAMPAIGNING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- COUNSEL AND CARE (Working name)
- ELDERLY INVALIDS' FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joan Elliott | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||
Karen Elizabeth Byrne | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.53k | £2.27k | £17.09k | £5.87k | £5.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.80k | £40.88k | £73.61k | £19.41k | £3.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/06/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/08/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2011
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST BY MEANS DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE TO ELDERLY INVALIDS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER HELP. TO ALLEVIATE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONGST ELDERLY INVALIDS BY ANY MEANS CONSIDERED NECESSARY FROM TIME TO TIME AND DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Avonmore Road
LONDON
W14 8RR
- Phone:
- 02076054200
- Email:
- charity@independentage.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window