POOR LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For people in need who dwell in the parish of Burnham, referred to us by Social Services. Citizens Advice Bureau, Burnham Health Centre, Schools, etc. We provide furniture, white goods, school uniforms, school trip funding, carer's holidays etc. We support the Burnham Lighthouse Project and Thames Hospice Care. We distribute about 300 christmas parcels at about £20 each.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 26 May 1962: Standard registration
- HITCHAM POORS LAND CHARITY THE HITCHAM TRUST (Working name)
- THE HITCHAM POOR'S LAND CHARITY (Working name)
- THE HITCHAM TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terrence John Gamble | Chair | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher John Hassell | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Irene Naylor | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Woodley | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Brown | Trustee | 23 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Judith Foster | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.78k | £7.15k | £6.61k | £7.98k | £8.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.84k | £3.96k | £7.09k | £6.49k | £11.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 May 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
UNREP VOL. 233 PP267, DEED OF EXHANGE 25TH MAY 1830. SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF 16TH SEPTEMBER 1963 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE 20TH MAY 1980 null
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF HITCHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WETHERED DRIVE
BURNHAM
SLOUGH
SL1 7NG
- Phone:
- 01628664662
- Email:
- joybrown02@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window