Financial history WILLIAM WOODWARD'S ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY

Charity number: 203465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/10/2020 23/10/2021 23/10/2022 23/10/2023 23/10/2024
Total gross income £3.77k £3.27k £3.26k £3.21k £7.15k
Total expenditure £6.22k £6.30k £7.06k £7.00k £7.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A