WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE TOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes - provides buildings and facilities for the benefit of the general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 03 April 1962: Standard registration
- 13 April 2015: Funds received from 1064960 THE CHIPPING CLUB ROOM
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wotton-under-Edge Town Council | Trustee | 26 July 1976 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.69k | £77.48k | £60.87k | £32.95k | £41.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.50k | £31.81k | £26.72k | £49.00k | £39.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.70k | £39.34k | £29.04k | £4.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 7TH FEBRUARY 1890 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF THE 2ND JUNE 1911, 26TH APRIL 1940, 15TH SEPTEMBER 1959, 14TH JUNE 1966 AND 26TH JULY 1976
Charitable objects
1. THE MAINTENANCE AND ADMINISTRATION OF THE TURST PROPERTY. 2. THE PROVISION OF A YEARLY SUM OF $12 FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHARITY KNOWN AS HUGH PERRY'S LECTURESHIP CHARITY. 3. THE MAINTENANCE OF WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE, TOWN HALL. 4. ANY OTHER PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE (AS IN 1890)
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOTTON UNDER EDGE TOWN COUNCIL: COU
2 GLOUCESTER STREET
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
GL12 7DN
- Phone:
- 01453843210
- Email:
- clerk@wotton-under-edge.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window