TEWKESBURY ALMSHOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses for retired people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 March 1962: Standard registration
- TEWKESBURY (CONSOLIDATED) CHARITIES (Previous name)
- TEWKESBURY CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Nicholas Duff Davies | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Nancy Oakes | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Raywood | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony Parkes | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Rankine Hutchinson | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Monk | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN HARBOTTLE | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|||||
PAUL DAVID HUNSTON | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|||||
RODGER HODGES | Trustee | 10 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.47k | £40.60k | £40.13k | £48.43k | £48.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.85k | £10.89k | £54.28k | £15.07k | £26.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2024 | 210 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 06/12/1957 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06/07/1973 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 FEB 2018
Charitable objects
THE ALMSPEOPLE SHALL BE POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE BOROUGH OF TEWKESBURY FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT OR WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, HAVE A DESIRE TO SETTLE IN THE BOROUGH OF TEWKESBURY ON A PERMANENT OR LONG TERM BASIS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF TEWKESBURY
Linked charities
- ALMSMEN OF THE FOUNDATION OF QUEEN MARY
- ANN SLAUGHTER
- BAPTIST VISCOUNT CAMPDEN
- CHARLES WYNDE
- DANIEL KEMBLE
- EDWARD POPHAM
- EDWARD RICHARDSON
- ELIZABETH DILLON
- ELIZABETH DOWDESWELL
- ELIZABETH HOPTON
- JOHN PORTER
- JOHN READ
- JOHN WRIGHT
- JULIANA BESTE
- LORD COVENTRY AND OTHERS
- MARGARET HICKS
- MARY TERRETT
- REVEREND HENRY COLLETT
- REVEREND ROBERT WRIGGAN
- SAMUEL BARNES
- SARAH HALL
- SIR FRANCIS RUSSEL
- THE CHURCH LANDS
- THOMAS BLIZARD
- THOMAS COOKE
- THOMAS LORD COVENTRY
- THOMAS POULTON
- WILLIAM CURTIS
- WILLIAM FERRER FOR POOR
- WILLIAM WAKEMAN
- WILLIAM WILSON
- 29 March 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABBEY OFFICES
CHURCH STREET
TEWKESBURY
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
GL20 5RZ
- Phone:
- 01684850959
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window