THE HOWE TRUST (WHEATLEY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Howe Trust (Wheatley) provides small grants for local people in need, and care for 26 acres of land. The land, which is known collectively as The Howe, includes some 100 allotments, a small orchard and memorial tree area as well as grassland, hedgerows and woodland. Working with other local and charitable organisations, we manage the land for bio diversity and the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £256 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 31 January 1963: Standard registration
- THE WHEATLEY COMMON ALLOTMENT - THE HOWE TRUST (Working name)
- THE WHEATLEY COMMON ALLOTMENT (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Fyffe | Chair | 16 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Tim Dixon | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Angela Julian | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Lee Stanton | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Celia Ann Pagel | Trustee | 03 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Sercombe | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gregory | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.74k | £14.09k | £11.61k | £14.63k | £17.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.86k | £10.23k | £13.99k | £8.28k | £21.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £256 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 06 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11 NOV 1974 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02 OCT 2020 as amended on 29 Jul 2021 as amended on 01 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WHEATLEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WHEATLEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Windy Ridge
Ladder Hill
Wheatley
Oxford
Oxford
- Phone:
- 07889639986
- Email:
- hello@howetrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window