Trustees THE UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 203538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shiela Margaret Loy Chair 18 November 2012
THE BLEWBURY PLAYERS
Received: On time
Dr Anthony Paul West Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
Diana Louise Esplin Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
Carol Ann Walker Trustee 11 November 2020
None on record
Christopher Frank Savage Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Rev Louise Gail Butler Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
MICHAEL CLIFFORD WIGG Trustee 08 July 2019
None on record
JILL ANNE WILLISON Trustee 19 February 2018
None on record