Accounts and annual returns ADMIRAL BLAKE LODGE NO 4692 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 203556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 August 2024 196 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required