Financial history VILLAGE HALL (CLEVEDON)

Charity number: 203594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.88k £3.28k £0 £28 £0
Total expenditure £5.77k £1.38k £697 £635 £894
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A