ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS GUILDFORD AND EPSOM BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 March 1962: Standard registration
- 25 June 2021: Funds received from 202104 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
- RSPCA GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Working name)
- RSPCA Guildford and Epsom Branch (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PROTECTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SURREY GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- RSPCA - GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCINDA RUTH POLLARD | Chair | 07 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Dr Alessandra Cappai | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Verne | Trustee | 22 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Abbi Moore | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN HOOKE | Trustee | 21 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN WINTER | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA TULLY | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE WHITE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.02k | £64.32k | £64.67k | £60.79k | £142.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.80k | £86.32k | £84.51k | £71.41k | £98.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009. as amended on 11 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
GUILDFORD AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Montys Purr
Chambers Road
Ash Vale
ALDERSHOT
Hampshire
GU12 5ER
- Phone:
- 07906924002
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window