Rodborough Lectureship Trust, charity for ecclesiastical purposes in the Ecclesiastical Parish of St. Mary Magdalene, Rodborough, Gloucestershire

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 26 April 1962: Standard registration
- RODBOROUGH LECTURESHIP CHARITY (Working name)
- CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELEN SARAH ACOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan Early | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Cedric John | Trustee | 17 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA JOYCE STATHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE TUBBS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.56k | £8.87k | £4.11k | £7.71k | £9.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.44k | £9.57k | £20.72k | £13.54k | £19.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 April 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7TH OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2018 as amended on 15 Nov 1989
Charitable objects
FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MAGDALEN, RODBOROUGH.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY MADDALENE, RODBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Camp Farm Cottage
The Camp
STROUD
Gloucestershire
GL6 7HL
- Phone:
- 07757706604
- Email:
- sgpcamp@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window