BRISTOL CLIFTON AND WEST OF ENGLAND ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity Number: 203695
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Information on the charity's activities is not available.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004

Total income: £4,664,000
Total expenditure: £4,928,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 1962: Standard registration
  • 09 August 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
  • BRISTOL ZOO GARDENS (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004
Total gross income £4.66m
Total expenditure £4.93m
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2004
Own use assets N/A
Long-term investments N/A
Other assets N/A
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A
Total liabilities N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 08 May 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 17 November 2005 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 02 April 2005 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT BRISTOL ON 29TH DECEMBER 1929 AND SCHEME OF THE 20TH SEPTEMBER 1978
Charitable objects
GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE BRISTOL AND CLIFTON AND WEST OF ENGLAND ZOOLOGICAL SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 12 March 1962 : Standard registration
  • 09 August 1996 : Removed