Trustees Exeter Church Charities

Charity number: 203721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sarah Patricia Cumming Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Cllr Alison Sheridan Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Alderman NORMAN SHIEL Trustee 06 October 2021
ST LEONARD'S NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days
ST LEONARD WITH HOLY TRINITY EXETER RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ST LEONARD'S CHRISTIAN TRUST
Received: On time
Dr IAN HOWARD Trustee 06 January 2021
EXETER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE CARE OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN (SAINT OLAVE'S TRUST)
Received: On time
Dr LESLEY HOWARD Trustee 06 January 2021
None on record
ANITA LONG Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
KEVIN BUTLER Trustee 08 April 2019
None on record
KEITH OWEN Trustee 01 July 2017
None on record