THE FORTESCUE GARDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The laying out, planting, improvement, maintenance and upkeep of the trust land as a garden for the enjoyment of the public and also for the purposes of experimentation and research (by the growth and propagation of trees and plants of any kind and in any manner) with a view to the futherance of the study and science of botany and the increase of knowledge in respect thereof.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £517 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 24 April 1962: Standard registration
- THE GARDEN HOUSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Brunsdon | Chair | 19 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Whitfield Smith | Trustee | 22 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Allen | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Robert Webster | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tim David Price | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Lewis | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Jonathon Bouch | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Watson | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.16k | £297.85k | £299.98k | £281.94k | £272.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.42k | £265.89k | £260.20k | £283.07k | £258.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.36k | £15.14k | £19.63k | £517 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 15 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 13 December 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 January 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 28 January 2021 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST NOVEMBER 1961 AS VARIED BY A SCHEMES OF 27 MARCH 1996 AND 25 NOVEMBER 1997 AND RESOLUTION DATED 5 DECEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE LAYING OUT PLANTING IMPROVEMENT MAINTENANCE AND UPKEEP OF THE TRUST LAND AS A GARDEN FOR THE ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC AND ALSO FOR THE PURPOSES OF EXPERIMENTATION AND RESEARCH (BY THE GROWTH AND PROPAGATION OF TREES AND PLANTS OF ANY KIND AND IN ANY MANNER) WITH A VIEW TO THE FURTHERANCE OF THE STUDY AND SCIENCE OF BOTANY AND THE INCREASE OF KNOWLEDGE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE METHODS AND PRACTICE OF HORTICULTURE.
Area of benefit
BUCKLAND MONACHORUM
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARDEN HOUSE
BUCKLAND MONACHORUM
YELVERTON
PL20 7LQ
- Phone:
- 01822854769
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window