Financial history MRS ELIZABETH MARIA FOY

Charity number: 203737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £36 £37 £38 £38 £38
Total expenditure £36 £37 £38 £38 £38
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A