ST MARKS INSTITUTE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and let the property in pursuance of the objectives:- 1. To promote religious education in accordance with the doctrines of the Church of England in the parish. 2. Provide recreational facilities for the inhabitants of the parish. 3. Further the religious and other charitable work of the Church of England in the parish. 4. Assist in the upkeep of the parish church of Woolston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southampton City
Governance
- 01 December 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MILES JULIUS ALBERT NEWTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JEAN BATCHELOR | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER L'ENFANT | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANNE BRADLEY | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN DOREEN LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.52k | £28.97k | £82.90k | £54.22k | £38.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.35k | £27.65k | £34.80k | £37.75k | £38.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 November 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONER'S DATED 9 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH 2. TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES TO PROMOTE THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING. 3. TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH. 4. TO ASSIST IN THE UPKEEP OF THE PARISH CHURCH FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WOOLSTON ST. MARKS
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 Brownlow Avenue
SOUTHAMPTON
SO19 7BY
- Phone:
- 02380433827
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window