THE FARINGDON COLLECTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PRESERVE, MAINTAIN AND IMPROVE THE (FARINGDON) COLLECTION AND ITS DISPLAY FOR PUBLIC EXHIBITION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- F C T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARON CHARLES MICHAEL FARINGDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||
Richard William Wheeler | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
LUCINDA MARIA HENDERSON | Trustee | 22 November 2013 |
|
|||||||||
LADY SARAH CAROLINE FARINGDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
FRANCIS GEORGE SCOTT RUSSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
MARTIN DRURY | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
THE HON J H HENDERSON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £301.96k | £215.40k | £252.83k | £286.47k | £279.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £253.85k | £214.19k | £231.76k | £316.99k | £362.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF GIFT DATED 9TH NOVEMBER 1956, AND SETTLEMENT DATED 24TH MARCH 1958
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE FOR ALL TIME AND TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND MAKE AVAILABLE FOR INSPECTION BY THE PUBLIC THE FURNISHINGS AND CONTENTS OF BUSCOT PARK, FARINGDON, BERKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ESTATE OFFICE
BUSCOT PARK
FARINGDON
SN7 8BU
- Phone:
- 01367240786
- Email:
- estbuscot@aol.com
- Website:
-
buscotpark.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window