THE PLYMOUTH BARBICAN TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The acquisition of land and buildings of historic or architectural value and interest in the City of Plymouth and to restore, preserve, improve,manage and develop such assets. To distribute, display, exhibit, present, archive, digitise or otherwise store, pictures, records or similar material relating to, but not exclusively, land and buildings in the South of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 14 February 1962: Standard registration
- PLYMOUTH BARBICAN ASSOCIATION LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER ROBINSON MBE | Chair | 23 June 1985 |
|
|||||||
Richard Atkinson | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Mary Hart Theyer | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Keith Charles Hood | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JAMES ALAN GROVES FCA | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Winfrid Scutt | Trustee | 15 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
PETER RHODES BURROWS | Trustee | 10 March 2014 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD DION BAYLY | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
EDWARD CHARLES KEAST | Trustee | 27 July 2012 |
|
|||||||
DAVID EDGAR BUCKINGHAM | Trustee | 12 May 2003 |
|
|
||||||
ANTHONY PETER GOLDING FCA CTA | Trustee | 31 March 1982 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.81k | £186.87k | £185.22k | £206.76k | £198.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.16k | £93.92k | £123.22k | £154.59k | £126.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/1957 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUN 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO ACQUIRE BY PURCHASE, OR EXCHANGE OR OTHERWISE LAND AND BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL VALUE AND INTEREST IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH, OR ANY RIGHTS OR INTEREST THEREIN AND TO RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, MANAGE, DEVELOP MORTGAGE, LEASE OR OTHERWISE DISPOSE OF THE SAME. TO DE RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY AND DEVELOP PUBLIC INTEREST IN THESE LANDS AND BUILDINGS. TO DISTRIBUTE, DISPLAY, EXHIBIT, PRESENT, ARCHIVE, DIGITISE OR OTHERWISE STORE, PICTURES, RECORDS OR SIMILAR MATERIAL RELATING TO, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, LAND AND BUILDINGS IN THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
CITY OF PLYMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
BROMHEAD CHARTERED ACCOUNTANTS
HARSCOMBE HOUSE
1 DARKLAKE VIEW
ESTOVER
PLYMOUTH
PL6 7TL
- Phone:
- 01752697397
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window