THE OTTERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We look after the Hall and Committee Room for use by parishioners and other organisations . The Hall is used by various groups and individuals for meetings, parties, keep fit and other activities. The local Primary School also use the hall for PE lessons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 12 March 1962: Standard registration
- OTTERTON PARISH HALL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Witherby | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Belinda Shoemaker | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Bove | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Geoffery Porter | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Lister | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Young | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Pankhurst | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Randall | Trustee | 02 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LOUISE COOLING | Trustee | 26 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOAN ELIZABETH SPENCE CULLEN | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.91k | £3.65k | £2.39k | £4.22k | £4.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55k | £3.46k | £2.62k | £14.19k | £5.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 January 2023 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 18TH MARCH 1924, SCHEME DATED 30TH OCTOBER 1964 AND SCHEME DATED 15TH MARCH 1995. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 JAN 2016
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF OTTERTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OTTERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glebelands
Otterton
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON
Devon
EX9 7JJ
- Phone:
- 07989432423
- Email:
- chair.ottertonvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window