CHARITY OF REVEREND THOMAS MEYRICK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donation to the appointed Pretty Maid of Holsworthy
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 05 January 1962: Standard registration
- THE PRETTY MAID (Working name)
- THE REVEREND THOMAS MEYRICK OR "THE PRETTY MAID CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY BRIAN FORSTER | Chair |
|
||||||
Jon Hutchings | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Svlvia Argyrou | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev ELIZABETH BURKE | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|||||
KIRSTIE STONE | Trustee | 05 May 2015 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH MARY CURTIS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186 | £187 | £186 | £2.15k | £361 | |
|
Total expenditure | £188 | £150 | £190 | £180 | £195 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED IN THE PREROGATIVE COURT OF CANTERBURY ON THE 21ST JUNE 1841 AND SCHEME OF CHARITY COMMISSION OF 10TH JUNE 1902.
Charitable objects
FOR THE YOUNG SINGLE WOMENT RESIDENT IN PARISH UNDER 30 YEARS OF AGE AND GENERALLY ESTEEMED BY THE YOUNG AS THE MOST DESERVING, MOST HANDSOME AND MOST NOTED FOR QUIETNESS AND ATTENDANCE AT CHURCH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLSWORTHY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Peter Peter & Wright
6-8 Fore Street
HOLSWORTHY
EX22 6ED
- Phone:
- 01409253262
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window