Financial history REVEREND C W GROVES ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 203788
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.36k £15.88k £18.24k £18.67k £19.96k
Total expenditure £6.95k £7.59k £5.95k £36.11k £4.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A