HENRY ROGERS (BURNHAM CHARITY)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charity operates in Burnham on Sea and Highbridge area. Generally involved over last few years in giving grants to school children to go on school trips where their parents cannot afford the same.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 03 March 1962: Standard registration
- HENRY ROGER'S CHARITY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE EMMELINE FRANCES PARKIN | Trustee | 07 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA CAROLE COMER MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev GRAHAM WITTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BURRIDGE-CLAYTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £635 | £645 | £655 | £677 | £728 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 156 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 April 2023 | 521 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 April 2023 | 886 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 1ST JUNE 1897 AND 3 JULY 1900,AS UPDATED BY SCHEME SEALED 17 APRIL 1984
Charitable objects
PENSIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE PARISH OF BURNHAM-ON-SEA AND HIGHBRIDGE
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BURNHAM-ON-SEA AND HIGHBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
31
College Street
Burnham on Sea
Somerset
TA8 1AS
- Phone:
- 01278780151
- Email:
- rhw@merryweatherwilliams.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window