Financial history DR RADCLIFFE'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 203845
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £8.49k £7.67k £8.06k £8.77k £9.03k
Total expenditure £9.88k £5.71k £6.52k £5.24k £44.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A